DC CER23-0096 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - Resolution ACR23-0096, Effective from Nov 08, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14820
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - Resolution ACR23-0096, Effective from Nov 08, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14820
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
20th Charter Year Anniversary of the Carlos Rosario International Public Charter School Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2019
Title
20th Charter Year Anniversary of the Carlos Rosario International Public Charter School Ceremonial Recognition Resolution of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0096, Effective from Nov 08, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14820 |
2019-11-08 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0096 |
2019-05-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-05-07 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-05-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |