DC CER23-0293 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - Resolution ACR23-0292, Effective from Nov 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13539
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - Resolution ACR23-0292, Effective from Nov 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13539
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Domestic Violence Awareness Month Recognition Resolution of 2020
Title
Domestic Violence Awareness Month Recognition Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-20 | Council | Resolution ACR23-0292, Effective from Nov 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13539 |
2020-11-20 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR23-0292 |
2020-09-22 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-09-22 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-09-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |