DC CER25-0188 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Resolution ACR25-0186, Effective from Mar 05, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 003880
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Resolution ACR25-0186, Effective from Mar 05, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 003880
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dunbar High School Indoor Track and Field 2024 DCIAA, Championship Recognition Resolution of 2024
Title
Dunbar High School Indoor Track and Field 2024 DCIAA, Championship Recognition Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Council | Resolution ACR25-0186, Effective from Mar 05, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 003880 |
2024-03-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number ACR25-0186 |
2024-03-05 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-03-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-03-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |