DC PR20-0130 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Resolution R20-0117 Effective from May 7, 2013 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 6891
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Resolution R20-0117 Effective from May 7, 2013 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 6891
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Washington Convention And Sports Authority Board Of Directors John Boardman Confirmation Resolution Of 2013
Title
Washington Convention And Sports Authority Board Of Directors John Boardman Confirmation Resolution Of 2013
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Council | Resolution R20-0117 Effective from May 7, 2013 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 6891 |
2013-05-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2013-04-22 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2013-04-18 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR20-0130 |
2013-04-10 | Council | Roundtable Hearing on PR20-0130 |
2013-03-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR20-0130 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-03-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2013-03-13 | Council | PR20-0130 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary |