DC PR20-0992 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-18 - Final Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-18 - Final Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commission On African Affairs Ms. Loide Rosa Jorge Confirmation Resolution Of 2014
Title
Commission On African Affairs Ms. Loide Rosa Jorge Confirmation Resolution Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-11-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-18 | Council | Final Reading |
2014-09-23 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2014-07-25 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR20-0992 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-07-11 | Council | PR20-0992 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary |