DC PR21-0460 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-25 - Resolution R21-0602 Effective from October 11, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 14379
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-25 - Resolution R21-0602 Effective from October 11, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 14379
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District Of Columbia Commemorative Works Committee Otto Condon Confirmation Resolution Of 2015
Title
District Of Columbia Commemorative Works Committee Otto Condon Confirmation Resolution Of 2015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-11 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-25 | Council | Resolution R21-0602 Effective from October 11, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 14379 |
2016-10-18 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-10-11 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR21-0460 |
2016-10-11 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R21-0602 |
2016-10-11 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-09-26 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-08-19 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-06-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2015-12-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR21-0460 Published in the DC Register |
2015-12-15 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2015-12-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |