DC PR21-0782 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-25 - Resolution R21-0658 Effective from November 25, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 14406
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-25 - Resolution R21-0658 Effective from November 25, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 14406
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sense Of The Council Regarding Completion Of The Lewis And Clark National Historic Trail Resolution Of 2016
Title
Sense Of The Council Regarding Completion Of The Lewis And Clark National Historic Trail Resolution Of 2016
Sponsors
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-11-15 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-25 | Council | Resolution R21-0658 Effective from November 25, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 14406 |
2016-11-15 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R21-0658 |
2016-11-15 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-11-08 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-11-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR21-0782 |
2016-10-24 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-10-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2016-06-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR21-0782 Published in the DC Register |
2016-06-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2016-05-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |