DC PR21-0860 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-20 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-20 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Closing Of Public Streets And Dedication Of Land For Street And Alley Purposes In And Abutting Squares 3953, 3954, 4024, 4025 And Parcel 143/45, S.o. 14-20357, Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2016
Title
Closing Of Public Streets And Dedication Of Land For Street And Alley Purposes In And Abutting Squares 3953, 3954, 4024, 4025 And Parcel 143/45, S.o. 14-20357, Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-12 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-20 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2016-07-22 | Council | Resolution R21-0581 Effective from July 12, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 9635 |
2016-07-12 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R21-0581 |
2016-07-12 | Council | Final Reading |
2016-07-12 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |