DC PR21-0983 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-01 - Resolution Number R21-0641 Effective from November 1, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-01 - Resolution Number R21-0641 Effective from November 1, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
University Of The District Of Columbia Career, Educational, And Legal Service Non-collective Bargaining Unit Employees Compensation System Changes Approval Resolution Of 2016
Title
University Of The District Of Columbia Career, Educational, And Legal Service Non-collective Bargaining Unit Employees Compensation System Changes Approval Resolution Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-01 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-01 | Council | Resolution Number R21-0641 Effective from November 1, 2016 |
2016-11-01 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R21-0641 |
2016-11-01 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-10-24 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2016-10-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2016-10-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR21-0983 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/36634/PR21-0983-Introduction.pdf |
Roll Call | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR21-0983 |