DC PR21-0986 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-01 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-01 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal Code Reform Commission Code Revision Advisory Group Appointment Paul Butler Emergency Approval Resolution Of 2016
Title
Criminal Code Reform Commission Code Revision Advisory Group Appointment Paul Butler Emergency Approval Resolution Of 2016
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-01 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2016-10-28 | Council | Resolution R21-0626 Effective from October 18, 2016 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 13355 |
2016-10-18 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R21-0626 |
2016-10-18 | Council | Final Reading |
2016-10-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR21-0986 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/36641/PR21-0986-Introduction.pdf |
Roll Call | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR21-0986 |