DC PR21-0990 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-01 - Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole, Subcommittee on Consumer Affairs
Pending: Council Committee of the Whole Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-01 - Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole, Subcommittee on Consumer Affairs
Pending: Council Committee of the Whole Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deemed approved 1/18/2017
Title
Signs Appendix Amendment Approval Resolution Of 2016
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-01 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole, Subcommittee on Consumer Affairs |
2016-10-28 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR21-0990 Published in the DC Register |
2016-10-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR21-0990 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/36677/PR21-0990-Introduction.pdf |