DC PR22-0799 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Resolution R22-0486 Effective from May 1, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5125
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Resolution R22-0486 Effective from May 1, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5125
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Washington Convention And Sports Authority Board Of Directors George T. Simpson Confirmation Resolution Of 2018
Title
Washington Convention And Sports Authority Board Of Directors George T. Simpson Confirmation Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | Council | Resolution R22-0486 Effective from May 1, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 5125 |
2018-05-01 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0486 |
2018-05-01 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-04-25 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-04-25 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0799 |
2018-04-11 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2018-03-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-03-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2018-03-16 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0799 Published in the DC Register |
2018-03-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |