DC PR22-0814 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - Resolution R22-0660 Effective from December 7, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13353
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - Resolution R22-0660 Effective from December 7, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13353
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District Of Columbia Sentencing Commission Molly M. Gill Reappointment Resolution Of 2018
Title
District Of Columbia Sentencing Commission Molly M. Gill Reappointment Resolution Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-20 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-07 | Council | Resolution R22-0660 Effective from December 7, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 13353 |
2018-12-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R22-0660 |
2018-11-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR22-0814 |
2018-11-20 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-11-01 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-10-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-04-13 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR22-0814 Published in the DC Register |
2018-04-10 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |