DC PR23-0195 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Resolution R23-0104 Effective from May 28, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7621
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

See "Other Documents" tab for the Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fiscal Year 2019 Revised Local Budget Emergency Declaration Resolution Of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28CouncilResolution R23-0104 Effective from May 28, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7621
2019-05-28CouncilApproved with Resolution Number R23-0104
2019-05-28CouncilFinal Reading
2019-05-28CouncilAmendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson)
2019-04-02CouncilRetained by the Council
2019-03-20CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback