DC PR23-0915 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-22 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-22 - Retained by the Council
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Council Period 23 Recess Rules Amendment Resolution of 2020
Title
Council Period 23 Recess Rules Amendment Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-28 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-08-21 | Council | Resolution R23-0498 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9958 |
2020-07-31 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR23-0915 Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-28 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-07-28 | Council | Chairman Mendelson Withdrew from Consideration Lines 47-56 |
2020-07-27 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |