DC PR23-0975 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-23 - Resolution R23-0543, Effective from Oct 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12277
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-23 - Resolution R23-0543, Effective from Oct 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12277
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification Nos. 3 and 4 to Contract No. DCAM-18-CS-0059 with Keystone Plus Construction Corporation Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Title
Modification Nos. 3 and 4 to Contract No. DCAM-18-CS-0059 with Keystone Plus Construction Corporation Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-06 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-23 | Council | Resolution R23-0543, Effective from Oct 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12277 |
2020-10-06 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0543 |
2020-10-06 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-10-06 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-09-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |