DC PR23-0994 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-30 - Resolution R23-0565, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12628
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-30 - Resolution R23-0565, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12628
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Fiscal Year 2021 to 2026 Dedicated Funding Grant Agreement Emergency Approval Resolution of 2020
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Fiscal Year 2021 to 2026 Dedicated Funding Grant Agreement Emergency Approval Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-30 | Council | Resolution R23-0565, Effective from Oct 20, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 12628 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0565 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-10-20 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-10-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |