DC PR23-1062 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-25 - Resolution R23-0633, Effective from Dec 15, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14813
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-25 - Resolution R23-0633, Effective from Dec 15, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14813
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Contract No. CW80913 with E-One, Inc. Emergency Approval Resolution of 2020
Title
Contract No. CW80913 with E-One, Inc. Emergency Approval Resolution of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-25 | Council | Resolution R23-0633, Effective from Dec 15, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 14813 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R23-0633 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-12-15 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-12-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |