DC PR25-0052 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-27 - Resolution R25-0009, Effective from Jan 17, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 001047
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-27 - Resolution R25-0009, Effective from Jan 17, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 001047
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Advisory Neighborhood Commissions Pandemic Provisions Extension Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Title
Advisory Neighborhood Commissions Pandemic Provisions Extension Congressional Review Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-17 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-27 | Council | Resolution R25-0009, Effective from Jan 17, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 001047 |
2023-01-17 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0009 |
2023-01-17 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-01-17 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-01-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |