DC PR25-0289 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - Resolution R25-0312, Effective from Nov 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 001228
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - Resolution R25-0312, Effective from Nov 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 001228
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Director of the Department of Buildings Brian J. Hanlon Confirmation Resolution of 2023
Title
Director of the Department of Buildings Brian J. Hanlon Confirmation Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-11-07 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-02 | Council | Resolution R25-0312, Effective from Nov 07, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 001228 |
2023-12-12 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-11-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0289 |
2023-11-07 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0312 |
2023-11-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-10-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-10-18 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-10-13 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-10-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-09-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-09-13 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-06-23 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0289 Published in the DC Register |
2023-06-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2023-06-15 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |