DC PR25-0351 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Resolution R25-0213, Effective from Jul 11, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 010049
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Resolution R25-0213, Effective from Jul 11, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 010049
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modification Nos. 3, 5, 8, and 10 to Contract No. DCAM-21-CS-IFB-0002 with Consys, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Title
Modification Nos. 3, 5, 8, and 10 to Contract No. DCAM-21-CS-IFB-0002 with Consys, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-07-11 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-21 | Council | Resolution R25-0213, Effective from Jul 11, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 010049 |
2023-07-11 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0213 |
2023-07-11 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-07-11 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2023-07-03 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |