DC PR25-0411 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - Resolution R25-0351, Effective from Nov 21, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 001233
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - Resolution R25-0351, Effective from Nov 21, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 001233
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
District of Columbia Judicial Disabilities and Tenure Commission Dr. Patrick Jackson Appointment Resolution of 2023
Title
District of Columbia Judicial Disabilities and Tenure Commission Dr. Patrick Jackson Appointment Resolution of 2023
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-11-21 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-02 | Council | Resolution R25-0351, Effective from Nov 21, 2023 Published in DC Register Page 001233 |
2024-01-16 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2023-11-21 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0351 |
2023-11-21 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2023-11-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of PR25-0411 |
2023-11-01 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2023-10-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-10-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-10-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2023-09-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0411 Published in the DC Register |
2023-09-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |