DC PR25-0677 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Resolution R25-0451, Effective from Mar 05, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 003156
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Resolution R25-0451, Effective from Mar 05, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 003156
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Litigation Support Fund Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Title
Litigation Support Fund Emergency Declaration Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Council | Resolution R25-0451, Effective from Mar 05, 2024 Published in DC Register Page 003156 |
2024-03-05 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0451 |
2024-03-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2024-03-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-03-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |