DE HB144 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act increases the number of members of a limited liability corporation who are eligible for exemption from workers compensation reimbursement from four to eight, making the number equal to the number of officers in a traditional corporation who are eligible for exemption.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Workers Compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2023-06-20 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2023-06-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2023-06-06 | Assigned to Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology Committee in Senate | |
2023-06-06 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2023-05-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 10 On Its Merits | |
2023-05-10 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House |