DE HB253 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Health & Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Health & Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
This Act is a substitute for House Bill 253. Like HB 253, it requires health insurance companies, including State employee/retiree health plans and Medicaid, to cover annual mammograms for the purpose of early detection for a woman 40 years of age or older, with or without referral from the womans health care provider. It also prohibits mammography facilities from requiring that women, 40 years of age or older, provide the facility with the name of a healthcare provider in order to receive an annual screening mammogram.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 16, 18, 29, And 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Mammograms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2024-04-18 | Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 7 ABSENT | |
2024-04-18 | Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2024-03-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2024-03-21 | Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2023-12-14 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 253, and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House |