DE HB304 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Defeated By House. Votes: 15 YES 22 NO 4 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Defeated By House. Votes: 15 YES 22 NO 4 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act substitutes gender neutral phrases for the ones currently contained in the State Song of Delaware. The proposed changes come at the request of Donn Devine, a retired Brigadier General in the Delaware National Guard and co-author of the State Song of Delaware, who believes that this new phrasing will make the song more relevant to future generations of Delawareans.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The State Song.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Sen. Harris McDowell [D] | Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] |
Sen. David Sokola [D] | Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] | Rep. Stephanie Bolden [D] | Sen. Charles Paradee [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Defeated By House. Votes: 15 YES 22 NO 4 ABSENT | |
2018-05-10 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 304 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-04-25 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-01 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 304 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-01-23 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |