DE HB68 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act extends the Automatic Residential Mortgage Foreclosure Mediation Program and the Office of Foreclosure Prevention and Financial Education through December 31, 2024. The Automatic Residential Mortgage Foreclosure Mediation Program and the Office of Foreclosure Prevention and Financial Education were established by 3 different Acts which each sunset after 2 years, based upon the effective date of each Act. The sunset periods have been extended for additional 2 year periods so that the Office of Foreclosure Prevention and Financial Education sunsets in September 2019; § 5062C and § 5062D of Title 10 sunset in January 2020; and § 5062A of Title 10 sunset in January 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Chapter 27, Volume 79 And Chapter 74, Volume 81 Of The Laws Of Delaware And Title 10 And Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Foreclosure And Consumer Protection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05 Signed by Governor
2019-05-07 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2019-04-17 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2019-04-03 Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
2019-03-28 Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 5 ABSENT
2019-03-28 Amendment HA 1 to HB 68 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2019-03-28 Amendment HA 1 to HB 68 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2019-03-20 Reported Out of Committee (Housing & Community Affairs) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
2019-03-06 Introduced and Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback