DE HB95 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act requires Family Court to award possession and provide for the care of companion animals when dividing marital property after considering the well-being of the companion animal.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 13 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Companion Animals In The Disposition Of Marital Property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2023-05-16 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2023-05-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2023-04-27 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate | |
2023-04-27 | Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 5 ABSENT | |
2023-04-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 5 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2023-03-28 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |