DE SB198 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act revises existing animal cruelty laws to include people who knowingly possess, own, buy, sell, transfer, or manufacture animal fighting paraphernalia with the intent to engage in or otherwise promote or facilitate such fighting as guilty of a class E felony.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Animal Fighting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House | |
2024-03-28 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 1 NO 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT | |
2024-03-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2024-01-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |