DE SB205 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Reported Out of Committee (Gaming & Parimutuels) in House with 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Reported Out of Committee (Gaming & Parimutuels) in House with 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act promotes increased capital investment at Delaware casinos by restructuring the table games licensing fee reduction currently received by lottery agents to allow capital investments greater than the minimum amounts required under ยง 4815(b)(3)a. of Title 29 of the Delaware Code to count toward the allowable license fee reductions. For ease of administration, this Act also aligns time periods for both table games and video lottery calculations.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The State Lottery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Gaming & Parimutuels) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2024-01-18 | Re-Assigned to Gaming & Parimutuels Committee in House | |
2024-01-18 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2024-01-18 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-01-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 7 On Its Merits | |
2024-01-11 | Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |