DE SB35 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on September 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Passed on September 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act enacts the Recognition of Emergency Medical Services Personnel Licensure Interstate Compact Act ("REPLICA"). With REPLICA, EMS personnel will be able to respond across state borders within the provision of their duties on a short term, intermittent basis on a privilege to practice under approved circumstances. REPLICA promotes compliance with the laws governing EMS personnel practice in each member state, home and remote, and gives states the ability to hold providers accountable from both. EMS personnel covered by REPLICA include those responding to calls for assistance across state lines as part of their duty, covering large scale planned events such as staffing concerts, sporting events, or large scale unplanned events where federal agencies are dispatched to support details, for example, wildland firefighting teams. REPLICA comes into effect on the date on which the compact statute is enacted into law in the 10th member state. Seven states have enacted REPLICA, including Virginia.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Adoption Of The Recognition Of Emergency Medical Services Personnel Licensure Interstate Compact Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2017-06-21 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2017-06-01 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2017-05-18 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-05-18 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 35 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-05-17 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 35 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2017-04-05 | Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2017-03-21 | Introduced and Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate |