DE SB66 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act enables the Department of Natural Resources and Environmental Control to employ Seasonal Patrol Officers without conferring on the seasonal patrol officers all the powers of investigation, detention, and arrest conferred by law on peace officers or constables under ยง 4701(a)(8) of Title 7. Seasonal patrol officers will assist the Department's park rangers and have limited powers to enforce the Division of Parks and Recreation's rules and regulations.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Employment Of Enforcement Personnel To Enforce The Department Of Natural Resources And Environmental Control's Division Of Parks And Recreation's Rules And Regulations.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Paradee [D] | Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Sen. Gerald Hocker [R] |
Sen. Brian Pettyjohn [R] | Sen. David Sokola [D] | Rep. Quinton Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-06-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-14 | Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House | |
2019-06-13 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-13 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 66 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Environmental & Natural Resources) in Senate with 3 Favorable | |
2019-04-09 | Introduced and Assigned to Environmental & Natural Resources Committee in Senate |