FL H0129 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires district school board to provide disability history & awareness instruction in public schools; requires DOE to assist in creating curriculum; creates Disability History & Awareness Advisory Council in DOE.
Title
Disability Awareness
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in K-12 Subcommittee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to K-12 Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2013-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0226 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/129 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0129/BillText/Filed/PDF |