FL H0225 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 292 (Ch. 2019-48)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 292 (Ch. 2019-48)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires district school board to allow student to wear dress uniform of United States Armed Forces or National Guard at graduation ceremony.
Title
Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 292 (Ch. 2019-48) |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/03/19, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2019-03-26 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 8:00 am, 12 HOB |
2019-03-20 | House | Now in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | CS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-19 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-19 | House | CS by PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S292 (Same As) 2019-05-24 - Chapter No. 2019-48