FL H0249 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises short title & legislative intent; prohibits operation of motor vehicle while holding or touching wireless communications device; provides exceptions; revises circumstances under which certain information may be admissible as evidence in proceeding to determine whether violation has been committed; revises procedures for collection & reporting by DHSMV of information recorded on citation; conforms provisions relating to use of wireless communications devices in school & work zones.
Title
Use of Wireless Communications Devices While Driving
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-10-10 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-09-30 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/249 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/249/BillText/Filed/PDF |