FL H0309 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 856
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 856
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes private provider inspections of onsite sewage treatment & disposal systems; specifies requirements for private providers & onsite sewage treatment & disposal system owners & authorized contractors; authorizes DEP to audit performance of such inspections; requires DEP to submit report to Legislature.
Title
Private Provider Inspections of Onsite Sewage Treatment and Disposal Systems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 856 |
2022-02-28 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3) |
2022-02-24 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-24 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-24 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2022-02-16 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2022-02-16 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-15 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-14 | House | Favorable with CS by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-10 | House | Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-13 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-01-13 | House | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-13 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-13 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | CS Filed |
2022-01-12 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-01-12 | House | Reported out of Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Favorable with CS by Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Added to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee agenda |
2021-10-26 | House | Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-10-26 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-10-26 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-10-26 | House | Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-10-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S856 (Same As) 2022-05-12 - Chapter No. 2022-105