FL H0309 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain fiscally constrained counties to use designated percentage of tourist development tax revenues received to reimburse for expenses incurred for certain purposes; provides specifications for use of those tax revenues.
Title
Tourist Development Taxes
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Shoaf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in Ways & Means Committee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-02-01 | House | Now in Ways & Means Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2023-01-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S640 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/309 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/309/BillText/Filed/PDF |