FL H0321 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requires physician performing abortion to, if gestational age of fetus is determined to be 22 weeks or more, provide specified information to woman; requires physician to offer to administer anesthetic or analgesic to fetus if abortion is to be performed on fetus whose gestational age is 22 weeks or more; provides exception for medical emergency; provides for civil actions by certain persons for violations of specified provisions related to informed consent & fetal anesthesia; provides for award of attorney's fees in certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Abortion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-05 | Original reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | |
2011-04-04 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-03-29 | CS by Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 3 -HJ 409 | |
2011-03-25 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Quality Subcommittee, 03/29/11, 9:00 am, 306 HOB | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 32 | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to HHS Quality Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 32 | |
2011-01-21 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1948 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
390 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 0111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
390 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |