FL H0321 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines "bump-fire stock"; prohibits importation, transfer or possession of bump-fire stock; authorizes person to relinquish bump-fire stock; requires person who does not relinquish bump-fire stock to destroy it.
Title
Bump-fire Stocks
Sponsors
Rep. David Richardson [D] | Rep. Kamia Brown [D] | Rep. John Cortes [D] | Rep. Ben Diamond [D] |
Rep. Nicholas Duran [D] | Rep. Joseph Geller [D] | Rep. Amy Mercado [D] | Rep. Carlos Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-10-18 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-10-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S456 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
S7026 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Chapter No. 2018-3
H7101 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S7026 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Chapter No. 2018-3
H7101 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/321 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/321/BillText/Filed/PDF |