FL H0333 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-194
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises definition of terms "navigation rules," "resident" or "resident of Florida," & "resident alien"; exempts specified persons participating in certain outdoor recreational events from requirements for hunting & fishing licenses & permits; revises number of days that commission may designate as free fishing days each year; revises requirements for restricted species endorsement on saltwater products license; deletes provisions for periodic adjustments of certain fees based on changes in the Consumer Price Index.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fish and Wildlife Conservation Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#129 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-17 Chapter No. 2013-194
2013-06-14 Approved by Governor
2013-06-10 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2013-04-29HouseOrdered enrolled
2013-04-26SenateCS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2013-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2013-04-25SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2013-04-25SenateRead 2nd time
2013-04-25SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 448
2013-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2013-04-25SenateWithdrawn from Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
2013-04-23SenateReceived
2013-04-18SenateReferred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations
2013-04-18SenateIn Messages
2013-04-17HouseCS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2013-04-17HouseRead 3rd time
2013-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2013-04-15HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/13
2013-04-01HouseCS/CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2013-04-01HousePlaced on Calendar
2013-03-29HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c)
2013-03-28HouseCS/CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2013-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/28/13, 10:30 am, Morris Hall
2013-03-18HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2013-03-18HouseFavorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2013-03-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/18/13, 5:00 pm, Reed Hall
2013-03-11HouseCS/CS by Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
2013-03-11HouseNow in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2013-03-08HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2013-03-05HouseCS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee read 1st time
2013-03-05HouseCS/CS by Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2013-03-05HouseIntroduced
2013-03-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 03/05/13, 1:00 pm, 12 HOB
2013-02-19HouseNow in Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee
2013-02-18HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2013-02-12HouseCS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2013-02-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 02/12/13, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall
2013-01-30HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Veteran and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2013-01-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0448 (Similar To) 2013-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 333 (Ch. 2013-194)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32702Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32872Amended CodeSee Bill Text
379101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
379353Amended CodeSee Bill Text
379354Amended CodeSee Bill Text
379361Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/333
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0333/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0333/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0333/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0333/BillText/c3/PDF
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0333/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0333/Amendment/873907/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0333/Amendment/637567/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0333/Amendment/086991/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0333/Amendment/033071/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0333/Amendment/862613/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0333/Amendment/593033/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0333/Amendment/352673/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0333/FloorVotes/PebwyoQvuTRy5ZvKkZQ9A5QhEro%3D%7C14%2FPublic%2FVotes%2FBill%2F20130417%2FHouseVote%5Fh0333c3129%2EPDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0333/FloorVotes/MMsDMrZvxci6YcVDxKxT%2F0EsFAY%3D%7C14%2FPublic%2FVotes%2FBill%2F20130426%2FSenateVote%5Fh0333c3012%2EPDF

Bill Comments

feedback