FL H0337 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3-2)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Chapter No. 2021-63
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3-2)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Chapter No. 2021-63
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires local governments & special districts to credit against collection of impact fees any contribution related to public facilities or infrastructure; provides conditions under which credits may not be applied; provides limitations on impact fee increases; provides retroactive operation; requires specified entities to submit affidavit attesting that impact fees were appropriately collected & expended; provides retroactive application; requires school districts to report specified information regarding impact fees.
Title
Impact Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#241 (Y: 94 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-03-31 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#241 (Y: 94 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-03-31 - House - House Ways & Means Committee (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Chapter No. 2021-63 | |
2021-06-04 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-03 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-26 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-26 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-26 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 28 NAYS 12 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 750 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-04-21 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-21 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-21 | House | CS passed; YEAS 94, NAYS 23 |
2021-04-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-20 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-20 | House | Amendment 579033 withdrawn |
2021-04-16 | House | Amendment 579033 filed |
2021-04-15 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3) |
2021-04-15 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2021) |
2021-04-15 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | CS Filed |
2021-04-15 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2021-04-05 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-05 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-05 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2021-04-02 | House | CS Filed |
2021-04-02 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-04-02 | House | Reported out of Ways & Means Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Favorable with CS by Ways & Means Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda |
2021-03-17 | House | Now in Ways & Means Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-16 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-16 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable with CS by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-12 | House | PCS added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-03 | House | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S750 (Same As) 2021-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 337 (Ch. 2021-63)