FL H0341 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-69
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires that, in event of crash involving railroad train, collection of certain information be at discretion of law enforcement officer having jurisdiction to investigate crash; revises information required to be contained in crash report; specifies that certain persons are not considered passengers for purpose of making crash reports; requires member of railroad train crew to furnish certain information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicles and Railroad Trains

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#58 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Chapter No. 2019-69
2019-06-07 Approved by Governor
2019-06-05 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-01HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-05-01SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2019-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-30SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-30SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1002
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-30SenateWithdrawn from Infrastructure and Security; Criminal Justice; Rules
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Criminal Justice; Rules
2019-04-18SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HouseCS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-03-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-28HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2019-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/28/19, 10:30 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-19HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-19HouseFavorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-08HouseNow in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-03-07HouseCS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-07HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-06HouseCS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 03/06/19, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-01-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1002 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 341 (Ch. 2019-69)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316068Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback