FL H0343 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Chapter No. 2017-81
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Chapter No. 2017-81
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises elements of offenses of using scanning device or reencoder with intent to defraud; prohibits use of skimming device with intent to defraud; prohibits possession, sale, or delivery of skimming device.
Title
Payment Card Offenses
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Criminal Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Robert Asencio [D] | Rep. John Cortes [D] |
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] | Rep. Amy Mercado [D] | Rep. Emily Slosberg-King [D] | Sen. Clay Yarborough [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#354 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#354 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Chapter No. 2017-81 | |
2017-06-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-04-28 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2017-04-28 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 766 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2017-04-28 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-28 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-24 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17 |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-21 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-20 | House | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/20/17, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2017-04-03 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/03/17, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-03-24 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-03-22 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-22 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-21 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/21/17, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0766 (Similar To) 2017-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 343 (Ch. 2017-81)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
817 | 625 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |