FL H0347 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 431 (Ch. 2019-73)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 431 (Ch. 2019-73)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain lien notices be sent through third-party mailing service; removes authorization of certain attorney fees; revises requirements for inspection & release of vehicles or vessels & personal property in such vehicles or vessels; requires third-party mailing services to apply to DHSMV; authorizes department to approve application if certain conditions are met; requires approved third-party notification services to maintain performance bond & conduct annual audit; authorizes department to deny, suspend, or revoke its approval; requires third-party mailing service to maintain certain records for specified period & allow inspection & copying of such records by department; authorizes towing-storage operators to send notices on their own behalf.
Title
Towing-storage Operating Liens
Sponsors
House State Affairs Committee | House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee | Sen. Ana Rodriguez [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#233 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 431 (Ch. 2019-73) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-25 | House | CS passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19 |
2019-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-11 | House | CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2019-04-11 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-04-10 | House | CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/10/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2019-04-03 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-29 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/02/19, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2019-03-25 | House | Now in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-03-25 | House | CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-22 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-19 | House | CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-01-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S826 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 431 (Ch. 2019-73)
H431 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-73
H431 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-73