FL H0349 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes amendment to s. 6, Art. VIII of State Constitution to authorize amendments or revisions to Miami-Dade County Home Rule Charter by special law approved by vote of electors of county; requires that such special law be proposed & approved at meeting of local legislative delegation & filed by member of that delegation; conforms references to reflect county's current name.
Title
Miami-Dade County Home Rule Charter
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died on Calendar | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 36 | |
2011-12-08 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 177 | |
2011-12-08 | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 177 | |
2011-12-01 | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 12/08/11, 9:00 am, Morris Hall | |
2011-11-15 | Now in State Affairs Committee -HJ 172 | |
2011-11-15 | Favorable by Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 -HJ 172 | |
2011-11-08 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 11/15/11, 4:00 pm, Reed Hall | |
2011-10-28 | Referred to Economic Affairs Committee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 36 | |
2011-10-13 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/349 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0349/BillText/Filed/HTML |