FL H0381 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes DOC to supervise certain misdemeanor offenders; removes prohibition on private entities providing probationary or supervision services to certain misdemeanor offenders & authorizes such entities to provide probation services & other specified programming to such offenders; revises who may approve specified contracts.
Title
Probationary or Supervision Services for Misdemeanor Offenders
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Subcommittee | Rep. Patt Maney [R] | Rep. Christopher Benjamin [D] |
Rep. Sam Garrison [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#32 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-04-07 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-07 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-01 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-31 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-03-31 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-25 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/31/2021) |
2021-03-22 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2021-03-18 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-18 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-18 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2021-03-08 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-04 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-04 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-04 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-03 | House | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-01 | House | Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda |
2021-02-08 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-01-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1006 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
948 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |