FL H0409 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Local Government Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Local Government Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits certain bidders from placing multiple bids during sale of certain tax certificates by tax collectors; authorizes individual counties to set interest rate on real property taxes; requires each county to set interest rate on tax certificates annually; establishes interest rate for certain tax delinquencies.
Title
Sales of Tax Certificates for Unpaid Taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Local Government Affairs Subcommittee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-11-05 | House | Referred to Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-10-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1128 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
197 | 172 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
197 | 432 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/409 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0409/BillText/Filed/PDF |