FL H0415 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Department of Lottery to create program that authorizes certain persons to purchase ticket or game at point-of-sale terminal that process credit & debit cards issued by financial institutions & retailers.
Title
Point-of-sale Terminals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-11-17 | House | Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee |
2015-11-17 | House | Favorable by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 3 |
2015-11-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 11/17/15, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2015-11-05 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-10-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0402 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
S7072 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations
S7072 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
24 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
24 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/415 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0415/BillText/Filed/PDF |