FL H0417 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires court to retain jurisdiction over child until age 21 if child elects to receive Foundations First Program services; requires assurance in child's case plan that efforts were made to avoid change in child's school; requires DCFS or community-based provider to provide reimbursement for costs of transportation provided for child in care; requires changes in child's school to be minimally disruptive; specifies criteria to be considered by department & community-based provider during transition of child to another school; requires children in care to attend school; provides penalties for caregivers who refuse or fail to ensure that child attends school regularly; specifies requirements for individual education transition plan meetings for children with disabilities; requires that child be provided with information relating to Road-to-Independence Program.
Title
Independent Living
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 41 | |
2011-10-28 | Referred to Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 42 | |
2011-10-19 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 6012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1451 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 903 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 0004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/417 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0417/BillText/Filed/HTML |