FL H0451 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides annual appropriation to DEP to implement Heartland Headwaters Protection & Sustainability Act; requires funds to be used & distributed for specified purposes.
Title
Land Acquisition Trust Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Melony Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-11-22 | House | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-11-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2023-11-22 | House | Referred to Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee |
2023-11-22 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-11-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S452 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/451 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/451/BillText/Filed/PDF |